IL SB2530 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0565
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that upon request of a law enforcement agency or a public safety answering point on behalf of a law enforcement agency, a wireless service provider shall provide call location information concerning the telecommunications device of a user to the requesting law enforcement agency or public safety answering point. Provides that a law enforcement agency or public safety answering point may not request information under this provision unless for the purposes of responding to a call for emergency services or in an emergency situation that involves the risk of death or serious physical harm. Provides that a wireless service provider may establish protocols by which the carrier voluntarily discloses call location information. Provides that a claim for relief may not be brought in a court against a wireless service provider or any other person for providing call location information if acting in good faith. Provides that the Illinois State Police shall obtain contact information from all wireless service providers authorized to do business in the State to facilitate a request from a law enforcement agency or a public safety answering point on behalf of a law enforcement agency for call location information. Provides that the Illinois State Police shall disseminate the contact information to each public safety answering point in the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WIRELESS SERVICE-CALL LOCATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-20SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0565
2021-08-20SenateEffective Date January 1, 2022
2021-08-20SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-24SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
2021-05-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2021-05-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-11HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Public Utilities Committee; 023-000-000
2021-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Public Utilities Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
2021-04-15SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 016-000-000
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026052605-52.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback