IL SB2530 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Public University Administrative Cost Decrease Act. Provides that all public universities shall annually submit a cost certification that certifies the level of spending dedicated to administrative costs for the current academic year. Provides that beginning with the 2020-2021 academic year, a Board of Trustees of a public university may not enact a budget that contains tuition or fee increases above that of the tuition and fees set in the 2017-2018 academic year until the Auditor General has verified that the cost certification submitted by the public university and due in the same calendar year of the proposed tuition or fees increase has shown a decrease of administrative costs by 25%. Amends the Illinois State Auditing Act. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNIVERSITIES-ADMIN COSTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3053-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback