IL SB2528 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Promotion Act. Removes a sunset date from provisions concerning grants from the Tourism Promotion Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-TOURISM PROMOTION.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-17HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
2018-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
206658bAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback