IL SB2528 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
If and only if House Bill 2860 of the 97th General Assembly becomes law, amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the driver of a motorcycle may proceed through a red light which fails to change to a green light "within a reasonable period of time not less than 120 seconds" (instead of "within a reasonable period of time"). Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-MOTORCYCLES-RED LIGHTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0762 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | Effective Date July 6, 2012 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2012-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-001 |
2012-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-001 |
2012-04-10 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2012-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-001-000 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 9, 2012 |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2012 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 009-000-000 |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-306 | Amended Code | Citation Text |