IL SB2527 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Director of the Department of Children and Family Services to execute and deliver a quitclaim deed for specified real property located in Cook County to the Carole Robertson Center for Learning upon payment of $1, subject to specified conditions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-LAND TRANSFER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-13HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lakesia Collins
2020-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2020-02-27HouseArrived in House
2020-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2020-02-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2020-02-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2020
2020-02-26SenateSecond Reading
2020-02-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2020
2020-02-25SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2020-02-18SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2020-02-04SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2020-01-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-01-28SenateFirst Reading
2020-01-28SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback