IL SB2527 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Prohibits a school board from limiting the number of dual credit courses a student may enroll in or the number of credits a student may receive from dual credit courses. Provides that if a school district establishes an online learning program for students (with exceptions), the school board may not limit (i) which students may participate in the program, (ii) the number of online courses a student may enroll in, or (iii) the number of credits a student may receive from online courses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DUAL CREDIT-ONLINE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Weaver
2018-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 011-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.62Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-23.11New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.55Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback