IL SB2526 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Includes a violation or attempted violation of involuntary sexual servitude of a minor or trafficking in persons based on involuntary sexual servitude of a minor as a sex offense for purposes of registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEX OFFENDER REG-SEX OFFENSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateReported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-03-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-14SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7301502Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback