IL SB2526 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Includes a violation or attempted violation of involuntary sexual servitude of a minor or trafficking in persons based on involuntary sexual servitude of a minor as a sex offense for purposes of registration.
Title
SEX OFFENDER REG-SEX OFFENSE
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] |
Sen. Chris Nybo [R] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-14 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 150 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |