IL SB2524 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in a county under township organization with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants and an appointed board of review, the county board may, by resolution, require that members of the board of review have certain professional assessment designations. Provides that, if the county board requires those designations, then provisions of the Code concerning the political makeup of the board of review do not apply to that county. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-BOARD QUALIFICATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 6-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 6-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |