IL SB2524 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0925
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health and Illinois Emergency Management Agency to collaborate to review and recommend new State laws for the disposal of unused antibiotics. Provides that the Department and Agency shall submit the recommendations to the General Assembly by January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISPOSAL-UNUSED ANTIBIOTICS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0925
2018-08-17SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-17SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Public Health
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-313New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback