IL SB2524 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0925
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0925
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health and Illinois Emergency Management Agency to collaborate to review and recommend new State laws for the disposal of unused antibiotics. Provides that the Department and Agency shall submit the recommendations to the General Assembly by January 1, 2020.
Title
DISPOSAL-UNUSED ANTIBIOTICS
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0925 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |