IL SB2524 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1078
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1078
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the following changes made by Public Act 97-224 apply only to personal injury liability insurance policies issued or renewed on and after July 1, 2012: (i) adding a first division vehicle including a taxi which is used for a purpose that requires a school bus driver permit to the list of certain vehicles required to carry personal injury liability insurance; and (ii) increasing the required amount of insurance to $1,000,000 (instead of $25,000) for any one person in any one accident and $5,000,000 (instead of $100,000) for two or more persons in any one accident. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-INSURANCE-BUS DRIVERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1078 |
2012-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date August 24, 2012 |
2012-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-24 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2012 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2012-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-032-000 |
2012-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-05-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-04-10 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2012-03-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2012 |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |