IL SB2522 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
Pending: House Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a rental car company that equips a vehicle with an electronic tolling device and does not offer a renter the ability to opt-out of its use shall not charge a renter a fee of more than $2 each day for its use. Provides that a rental car company shall not charge a daily fee on any day the renter does not drive through an electronic toll or only drives through an electronic toll collection system for which no alternative payment option exists. Provides that a rental car company that provides or offers a motor vehicle with an electronic tolling device shall clearly include the applicable terms and conditions of its use in the rental agreement and post the applicable terms and conditions on the business premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOLL TRANSPONDER-RENTAL CARS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-10HouseArrived in House
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-001
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Stadelman
2018-05-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-03SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateDo Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 007-002-001
2018-04-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62556-305Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback