IL SB2522 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0878
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0878
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a rental car company that equips a vehicle with an electronic tolling device and does not offer a renter the ability to opt out of its use shall not charge a renter a fee of more than $2 each day for its use. Provides that a rental car company shall not charge a daily fee on any day the renter does not drive through an electronic toll or only drives through an electronic toll collection system for which no alternative payment option exists. Provides that a rental car company that provides or offers a motor vehicle with an electronic tolling device shall clearly include the applicable terms and conditions of its use in the rental agreement and post the applicable terms and conditions on the business premises.
Title
TOLL TRANSPONDER-RENTAL CARS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 96 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 62 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 62 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0878 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-020-001 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Pension Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-05-30 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-05-30 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-05-30 | House | Home Rule Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-05-30 | House | Correctional Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-05-30 | House | Balanced Budget Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-05-30 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-05-30 | House | Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-05-30 | House | Motion Prevailed 062-050-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Litesa E. Wallace; - All Notes Requested |
2018-05-30 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-30 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-30 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-30 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-30 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-30 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-30 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-30 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-05-30 | House | Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2018-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2018-05-24 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2018-05-24 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2018-05-24 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2018-05-24 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-001-000 |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-001 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Stadelman |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 007-002-001 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |