IL SB2521 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that a dealer or other creditor shall not use electronic tracking technology or starter interrupt technology in connection with the credit sale, loan, or lease of a motor vehicle unless the technology is used solely to verify and maintain the operational status of the tracking technology, to locate the vehicle for repossession, to repossess the vehicle, or to locate the vehicle to service the account or keep the account current. Requires specified conditions to be met and certain written disclosures to be made to the consumer regarding the use of the technology. Contains provisions regarding: use of the technology in a criminal investigation; damages for violations; repossession; privacy, storage, and destruction of data; and other matters. Provides that specified violations are unlawful practices within the meaning of the Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONS FRAUD-STARTER INTERRUPT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-002-000
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052VVVNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback