IL SB2520 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. The court on its own motion, or an interested person in a cause, proceeding, or other matter, civil or criminal, (rather than only in a cause or proceeding, civil or criminal) may file a petition alleging that the State's Attorney has an actual conflict of interest in the cause or proceeding. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CNTY-STATE'S ATTORNEY CONFLICT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-001-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2021
2021-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-006-000
2021-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins
2021-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-20HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 008-002-000
2021-05-13HouseCommittee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
2021-05-13HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2021-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2021-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2021-05-07HouseArrived in House
2021-05-06SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-001-000
2021-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2021
2021-04-29SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Rose
2021-04-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 006-000-000
2021-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Judiciary
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152054fNew CodeSee Bill Text
5555-1186New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2520&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2520.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2520eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2520enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2520sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2520sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2520sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2520ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2520_05062021_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB2520_05292021_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2520ham001_05302021_080000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback