IL SB2520 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1070
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1070
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metro-East Sanitary District Act of 1974. Provides that a sanitary district may, by ordinance, annex property within any unit of local government if the property is contiguous to the district and served by the sanitary district. Specifies the requirements of the ordinance. Sets forth the procedure for annexation. Makes other changes.
Title
METRO-EAST SANITARY DIST-ANNEX
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-16 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1070 | |
2010-07-16 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-16 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-033-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-15 | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000 | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2010-03-10 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading - Passed; 045-006-000 | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2010 | |
2010-02-18 | Second Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 16, 2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Do Pass Local Government; 008-001-000 | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-12 | First Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |