IL SB2519 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Parks Act. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall reach an agreement with Dawson Township in McLean County regarding the sale of a portion of Moraine View State Park to the township. Provides that Dawson Township shall pay the full market value for the property. Provides that the sale and conveyance of the acreage shall not transpire until the Department is able to acquire an adequate replacement property that satisfies federal requirements, and the Department shall have 5 years from the date of the agreement with Dawson Township to acquire the replacement property. Effective immediately.
Title
MORAINE VIEW-SALE-STATE PARKS
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2519&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2519.htm |