IL SB2518 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any charitable non-for-profit organization that is exempt from federal income taxation under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code engaged in the maintenance and repair of motor vehicles may make application to the Secretary of State for special dealer plates under the Code for use on a motor vehicle prior to donating the vehicle to a low-income individual. Provides that the Secretary shall, upon granting the application, issue the charitable organization a maximum of 8 sets of special plates at a fee set for charitable vehicles under the Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-CHARITY-DEALER PLATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-07HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rose
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-602Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback