IL SB2518 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any charitable non-for-profit organization that is exempt from federal income taxation under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code engaged in the maintenance and repair of motor vehicles may make application to the Secretary of State for special dealer plates under the Code for use on a motor vehicle prior to donating the vehicle to a low-income individual. Provides that the Secretary shall, upon granting the application, issue the charitable organization a maximum of 8 sets of special plates at a fee set for charitable vehicles under the Code. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-CHARITY-DEALER PLATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rose |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |