IL SB2517 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning in fiscal year 2020 and each year thereafter, the System shall calculate the projected amount of the increase in the employer normal cost of benefits, expressed as a percentage of salary and reflecting separate amounts for Tier 1 and Tier 2 benefits, resulting from any increase in salary over the preceding school year, expressed as a percentage of salary. Provides that except for a teacher who first becomes a teacher on or after the implementation date of certain benefits, if the amount of a teacher's salary for any school year beginning on or after July 1, 2019 exceeds the member's annual full-time salary rate with the same employer for the previous school year, then the teacher's employer shall pay to the System the projected amount of the increase in the employer normal cost of benefits, as determined by the System and reflecting whether the teacher will receive Tier 1 or Tier 2 benefits, resulting from the increase in the member's salary over the previous school year. Excludes earnings increases paid to members under contracts or collective bargaining agreements entered into, amended, or renewed before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Excludes earning increases paid to members who first become members on or after the implementation date of certain benefits. Defines "Tier 1 benefits" and "Tier 2 benefits". Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-TRS-EMPLOYR CONTRIBUTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-19SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-14SenateRe-referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.42New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-106.4aNew CodeSee Bill Text
40516-106.4bNew CodeSee Bill Text
40516-158Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback