IL SB2517 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning in fiscal year 2020 and each year thereafter, the System shall calculate the projected amount of the increase in the employer normal cost of benefits, expressed as a percentage of salary and reflecting separate amounts for Tier 1 and Tier 2 benefits, resulting from any increase in salary over the preceding school year, expressed as a percentage of salary. Provides that except for a teacher who first becomes a teacher on or after the implementation date of certain benefits, if the amount of a teacher's salary for any school year beginning on or after July 1, 2019 exceeds the member's annual full-time salary rate with the same employer for the previous school year, then the teacher's employer shall pay to the System the projected amount of the increase in the employer normal cost of benefits, as determined by the System and reflecting whether the teacher will receive Tier 1 or Tier 2 benefits, resulting from the increase in the member's salary over the previous school year. Excludes earnings increases paid to members under contracts or collective bargaining agreements entered into, amended, or renewed before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Excludes earning increases paid to members who first become members on or after the implementation date of certain benefits. Defines "Tier 1 benefits" and "Tier 2 benefits". Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-TRS-EMPLOYR CONTRIBUTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-106.4a | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-106.4b | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |