IL SB2517 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0573
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the chief county assessment officer shall return the assessment books to the board of review on or before the third Monday in June of the assessment year, or on or before the 90th day following the certification of the final township assessment roll in the county, whichever is later (currently, on or before the third Monday in June of the assessment year). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-ASSESSMENT BOOKS
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0573 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date July 15, 2016 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 012-000-000 |
2016-05-12 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-12 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 004-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2016-04-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-04-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 17, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 9-245 | Amended Code | Citation Text |