IL SB2514 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0877
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Smoke Free Illinois Act. Changes references from "fine" to "civil penalty" throughout the Act and makes corresponding changes. Provides that law enforcement agencies (rather than local law enforcement agencies) shall enforce the provisions of the Act through the issuance of citations and may assess specified civil penalties (rather than fines). Makes related changes in provisions concerning complaints and injunctions. Provides that funds designated for the Department of State Police or Department of Natural Resources by provisions concerning the distribution of civil penalty moneys shall be deposited by the respective Department into a specified fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SMOKE FREE IL-CIVIL PENALTIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0877
2018-08-14SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-14SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-26SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018
2018-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe
2018-03-13SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-14SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4108240Amended CodeCitation Text
4108245Amended CodeCitation Text
4108250Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback