IL SB2514 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0877
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0877
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Smoke Free Illinois Act. Changes references from "fine" to "civil penalty" throughout the Act and makes corresponding changes. Provides that law enforcement agencies (rather than local law enforcement agencies) shall enforce the provisions of the Act through the issuance of citations and may assess specified civil penalties (rather than fines). Makes related changes in provisions concerning complaints and injunctions. Provides that funds designated for the Department of State Police or Department of Natural Resources by provisions concerning the distribution of civil penalty moneys shall be deposited by the respective Department into a specified fund.
Title
SMOKE FREE IL-CIVIL PENALTIES
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Brian Stewart [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0877 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 82 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 82 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 82 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |