IL SB2513 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0876
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Creates an advisory council within the Department of Insurance to review and make recommendations to the Department regarding rules to be adopted by the Department concerning continuing education courses, course materials, curriculum, and credentials of instructors. Provides that the members shall be appointed by the Director of Insurance. Provides criteria for membership, length of terms, term limits, and quorum. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-CONT ED ADVISRY COUNCIL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0876
2018-08-14SenateEffective Date August 14, 2018
2018-08-14SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 014-000-000
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 014-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155401.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback