IL SB2511 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a back-up lamp equipped on a motor vehicle shall emit a white or amber light without glare. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-BACKUP LAMP-AMBER LIGHT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Transportation; 018-000-000
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625512-209Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback