IL SB2502 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that on and after January 1, 2012, providers participating in a quality improvement program approved by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall be reimbursed for screening and diagnostic mammography at the same rate as the Medicare program's rates, including the increased reimbursement for digital mammography (rather than on and after July 1, 2008, screening and diagnostic mammography shall be reimbursed at the same rate as the Medicare program's rates, including the increased reimbursement for digital mammography). Removes language concerning bonus payments to mammography facilities meeting the standards for screening and diagnosis. Effective January 1, 2012.
Title
MEDICAID-MAMMOGRAPHY RATE
Sponsors
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] |
Rep. Derrick Smith [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Rep. Al Riley [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-11-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-11-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0638 |
2011-12-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-12-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-12-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-11-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2011-11-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2011-11-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-11-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2011-11-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2011-11-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-11-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-11-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2011-11-29 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-11-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-11-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2011 |
2011-11-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-11-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-11-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-11-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 9, 2011 |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 8, 2011 |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2011-11-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2011-11-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 10, 2011 |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-10-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |