IL SB2501 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to cover immunosuppressive drugs and related services associated with post-kidney transplant management for noncitizens who are not eligible for comprehensive medical benefits but meet certain residency and financial requirements under the Code. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-NONCITIZENS-KIDNEY CARE
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] |
Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Appropriations- Health |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-4.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2501&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2501.htm |