IL SB2501 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for qualified education expenses incurred by employers on behalf of qualifying apprentices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-APPRENTICESHIP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355227New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback