IL SB2500 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-27 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-27 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides for a new board of trustees of the City Colleges of Chicago beginning with the 2023 consolidated election. Sets forth provisions concerning nominating petitions and ballots. Provides that the City of Chicago shall be subdivided into 20 trustee districts by the General Assembly for seats on the board of trustees, in addition to one at-large trustee. Provides that the City of Chicago trustee districts must be drawn on or before May 31, 2022. Provides that in the year following each decennial census, the General Assembly shall redistrict the trustee districts to reflect the results of each decennial census. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
COM COL-ELECT-BD OF TRUSTEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 7-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 7-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2500&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2500.htm |