IL SB2495 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that, among other restrictions, no legislator may accept or participate in any way in any representation case before the State of Illinois or any unit of local government in this State on any matter filed on or after February 1, 2018 that involves a challenge to any tax or proposed assessment of any tax or fee. Provides that the prohibition against participation in such a representation case does not apply in regards to a person with whom the legislator maintains a close economic association, unless a fee or compensation received regarding any matter that involves a challenge to any tax or proposed assessment of any tax or fee is received by the legislator directly or indirectly through any interest in a partnership, limited liability corporation, or other business entity. Modifies the term "representation case" to include matters before a unit of local government. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOV ETHICS-REPRESENTATION CASE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-02-08SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-02-08SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54201-113Amended CodeCitation Text
54202-104Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback