IL SB2495 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that, among other restrictions, no legislator may accept or participate in any way in any representation case before the State of Illinois or any unit of local government in this State on any matter filed on or after February 1, 2018 that involves a challenge to any tax or proposed assessment of any tax or fee. Provides that the prohibition against participation in such a representation case does not apply in regards to a person with whom the legislator maintains a close economic association, unless a fee or compensation received regarding any matter that involves a challenge to any tax or proposed assessment of any tax or fee is received by the legislator directly or indirectly through any interest in a partnership, limited liability corporation, or other business entity. Modifies the term "representation case" to include matters before a unit of local government. Effective immediately.
Title
GOV ETHICS-REPRESENTATION CASE
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Oberweis [R] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] | Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-02-08 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jim Oberweis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 1-113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 420 | 2-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2495&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2495.htm |