IL SB2495 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Charter Schools Law in the School Code. Deletes language that specifies the total number of charter schools that are permitted to operate at one time under the Law. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-REMOVE CHARTER SCH LMT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-05 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010 | |
2010-02-17 | To Executive Subcommittee on Education | |
2010-02-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-10-29 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-29 | First Reading | |
2009-10-29 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James T. Meeks |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2495&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2495.htm |