IL SB2493 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Pending: House Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that a person may supplementally feed deer with items otherwise prohibited by the Code when not in active deer hunting season which shall be implemented by the Department of Natural Resources by rule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE CD-DEER FEED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-001-000
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-001-000
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose
2018-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 008-000-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 010-000-000
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.26Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback