IL SB2491 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0974
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that a licensed dental hygienist working under the supervision of a dentist and employed by a federally qualified health center shall be reimbursed for dental services provided to medical assistance recipients at the federally qualified health center's encounter rate. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-DENTAL HYGIENIST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-19SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0974
2018-08-19SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-04-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-12HouseArrived in House
2018-04-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback