IL SB2490 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for an employer who hires a qualified employee to work at a location in the State. Sets forth the amount of the credit. Provides that the credit shall be increased if (i) the qualified employee is hired to work at a location in a disproportionately impacted area or (ii) on the date the qualified employee is hired, the qualified employee resides in a disproportionately impacted area. Limits the total amount of income tax credits that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may issue over the duration of the program. Provides that the term "qualified employee" means a resident of the State who is hired by the taxpayer to fill a full-time net new job and was unemployed as a result of COVID-19 prior to the date he or she was hired by the taxpayer. Provides that the term "qualified employee" does not include an individual who was furloughed by the taxpayer. Effective immediately.
Title
INCOME TAX-EMPLOYMENT CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2490&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2490.htm |