IL SB2487 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Funds Investment Act, the Illinois Banking Act, the Savings Bank Act, and the Illinois Credit Union Act. Requires any financial institution or other entity receiving public funds, State bank, savings bank, and credit union with assets of at least $100,000,000 to submit an annual report on its voluntary supplier diversity program to the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Sets forth provisions on what the report must include and how and when the report must be submitted. Provides that, for each report, the Department shall publish the results on its Internet website for 5 years after submission. Requires the Department to hold an annual supplier diversity workshop in February of 2019 and every February thereafter to discuss the reports with representatives of the financial institutions, State banks, savings banks, or credit unions and vendors. Provides that the Department shall prepare a template for voluntary supplier diversity reports. Effective immediately.
Title
BANKS-SUPPLIER DIVERSITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 205 | 9008.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 305 | 9.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
205 | 5 | 47.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 235 | 6.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2487&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2487.htm |