IL SB2486 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Record Review Act. Provides that an individual aggrieved by a disclosure of a disciplinary report in violation of the Act may file a complaint with the Director of Labor or file an action in court within 7 years after the violation.
Title
PERSONNEL RECORD DISCIPLINE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0562 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 013-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 40 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |