IL SB2486 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Funds Investment Act. Provides that any public agency may invest any public funds in obligations (currently, short term obligations) of corporations organized in the United States with assets exceeding $500,000,000 if such obligations mature not later than 3 years (currently, 270 days) from the date of purchase, in addition to other criteria. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC FUNDS-CORPORATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2018
2018-02-28SenateDo Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Local Government
2018-02-14SenatePostponed - Local Government
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
302352Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback