IL SB2485 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that the lien for nonpayment of common expenses and fines attaches after the unit owner is given written notice and an opportunity to be heard. Provides that the board of managers may seek remedies under the Act after providing the unit owner or agent of the unit owner with written notice of the default and providing an opportunity to be heard regarding any fees that are in dispute. Provides that the bylaws shall provide that the association has no authority to initiate collection proceedings against a unit owner until the board of managers issues a 30-day written notice of delinquency, and an opportunity for a hearing is given to dispute any amounts due. Provides that the board of managers has the power, after written notice (instead of "notice") and an opportunity to be heard, to levy reasonable fines for violation of the declaration, bylaws, and rules and regulations of the association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONDOS:DEFAULT-WRITTEN NOTICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-24HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-24HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-05-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-16HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-05-16HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-05-16HouseArrived in House
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-001
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Murphy
2018-05-16SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-001
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-001-001
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76560518Amended CodeCitation Text
76560518.4Amended CodeCitation Text
7656059Amended CodeCitation Text
7656059.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback