IL SB2483 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that not less than 75% of the amounts collected by a municipality within DuPage County pursuant to the municipal hotel operators' occupation tax and municipal hotel use tax shall be used to promote tourism within that municipality. Provides that the remainder of the amounts collected may be used by the municipality for economic development or capital infrastructure. Provides for a repeal date of December 31, 2019.
Title
HOTEL OCCUPATION & USE REVENUE
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Christine Winger [R] |
Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Assigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-001-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 8-3-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-14a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-14b | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 8-3-14c | New Code | See Bill Text |