IL SB2482 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Deletes language providing that one hour of public or community service shall be equivalent to $4 of assessment. Provides instead that the period of public service necessary to satisfy the assessment shall be set by the court, but in no event shall the hourly rate of the public or community service performed by the defendant be equivalent to less than $10 per hour. Deletes language providing that the performance of public or community service shall be a condition of probation, conditional discharge, or supervision and shall be in addition to the performance of any other period of public or community service ordered by the court or required by law. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. In a provision regarding assessment waiver, removes language from the definition of "assessments" excluding assessments tied to violations of the Illinois Vehicle Code. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM&TRAFFIC ASSESSMENT-CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 135 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 124A-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |