IL SB2481 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Commitment to Justice Act and includes legislative findings. Amends the Court of Claims Act. Removes the $100,000 limit on awards in tort cases. Provides that the changes apply to cases filed on or after July 1, 2015. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COURT OF CLAIMS AWARD LIMITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-001
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hastings
2018-04-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-17SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7055058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback