IL SB2481 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Commitment to Justice Act and includes legislative findings. Amends the Court of Claims Act. Removes the $100,000 limit on awards in tort cases. Provides that the changes apply to cases filed on or after July 1, 2015. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COURT OF CLAIMS AWARD LIMITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 042-007-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-003-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 079-033-002
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-05-30HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-28HouseHome Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-28HouseCorrectional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-28HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-28HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2018-05-25HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-05-25HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseJudicial Note Filed
2018-05-24HousePension Note Filed
2018-05-24HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2018-05-24HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-24HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-24HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-24HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-24HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-24HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-24HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-24HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-24HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-24HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-001
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hastings
2018-04-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-17SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7055058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2481&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2481.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2481eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2481enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2481sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2481sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2481ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2481ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2481_04242018_046000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2481_05302018_026000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2481ham002_05312018_041000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback