IL SB2481 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the alternative general homestead exemption applies on a permanent basis. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-ALT HOMESTEAD-EXTEND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-24 | To Revenue Subcommittee on Property Taxes | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Revenue | |
2010-01-19 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-10-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-15 | First Reading | |
2009-10-15 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2481&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2481.htm |