IL SB2478 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Sports Betting Consumer Protection Act. Authorizes a State agency or entity charged by law with enforcing the Act, unless prohibited under federal law and as otherwise provided by State law, to adopt rules which prohibit or authorize sports betting or electronic sports betting by an electronic sports betting patron or sports betting facility patron through an electronic sports betting account on an electronic sports betting platform or other means with an electronic sports betting licensee or sports betting facility licensee. Allows the State agency to also require reporting of sports betting adjusted gross receipts to it by electronic sports betting licensees or sports betting facility licensees. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Exempts activities authorized under the Sports Betting Consumer Protection Act from gambling offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SPORT BETTING-CONSUMER PROTECT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-21SenateRe-assigned to Gaming
2018-05-21SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Gaming
2018-02-08SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720528-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720528-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback