IL SB2472 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Prohibits a carnival from offering, awarding, or giving away any live animal in a game, contest, or tournament involving skill or chance. Provides that the carnival may offer a coupon, certificate, or voucher to obtain the live animal from a licensed pet store as the prize. Defines "carnival".
Title
ANIMALS-AWARD OF A LIVE ANIMAL
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (AG) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2020-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 70 | 2.01i | New Code | See Bill Text |
510 | 70 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2472&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2472.htm |