IL SB2471 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0973
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Volunteer Emergency Worker Job Protection Act. Provides that "volunteer emergency worker" means a person who serves as a member of a fire department of a fire protection district, municipality, or other unit of government on other than a full-time career basis and who meets the requirements for volunteer status under the Code of Federal Regulations and Opinion Letters from the United States Department of Labor. Provides that "volunteer emergency worker" also means, including, but not limited to, a person who serves on a volunteer basis and is licensed under the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act as an Emergency Medical Responder (EMR)(First Responder), Emergency Medical Technician (EMT), Emergency Medical Technician-Intermediate (EMT-I), Advanced Emergency Medical Responder (A-EMT), or Paramedic (EMT-P), or a volunteer ambulance driver or attendant, and the person does not work in one of these capacities for another fire department, fire protection district, or governmental entity on a full-time career basis. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VOLUNTEER EMERGENCY WORKER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-19SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0973
2018-08-19SenateEffective Date August 19, 2018
2018-08-19SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-001-000
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2018
2018-02-28SenateDo Pass Labor; 015-000-000
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
507483Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback