IL SB2462 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that an insurer that issues a policy or contract insuring against liability for injury to any person or against liability for injury to or destruction of property, arising out of ownership or lease of residential one, 2, 3, or 4 dwelling real property, may cancel, charge, or impose an increased premium or rate for or refuse to issue or renew that kind of policy or contract based in whole or in part upon the harboring of a dog found to be vicious under the Animal Control Act upon the insured property. Provides that an insurer that issues a policy or contract insuring against liability for injury to any person or against liability for injury to or destruction of property, arising out of ownership or lease of residential one, 2, 3, or 4 dwelling real property, may not cancel, charge, or impose an increased premium or rate for or refuse to issue or renew that kind of policy or contract based in whole or in part upon the harboring of a specific breed of dog upon the insured property.
Title
HOMEOWNER'S LIABILITY INS-DOGS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |